skip to content

Landry, Jacques

CPSO#: 31087

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jan 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1998