skip to content

Lancaster, Bobbi D

CPSO#: 31711

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lancaster, Robert Douglas (used until: 13 Feb 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2019