skip to content

Lan, John

CPSO#: 26445

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 May 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lan Hing Ming, Shian Foong (used until: 19 Jun 1979 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Lan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: CCIM 12 Main St N Markham ON L3P 1X2 email:[email protected]
Date Received: 11 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020