skip to content

Lan Hing Ming, Lip Foong

CPSO#: 25283

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Oct 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents may send medical record requests to: 2535 Kevin St LaSalle ON N9H 2R3
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019


Address: 886 Massimo Crescent Windsor ON N9G 3C6 Tel: 519-250-7433
Date Received: 02 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2016