skip to content

Lampton, Lucius Marion

CPSO#: 87469

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mississippi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2015