skip to content

Lamptey, Brent Allister

CPSO#: 97697

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Lamptey, Brent (used until: 10 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brent Lamptey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lamptey ( CPSO# 97697 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENT ALLISTER LAMPTEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMPTEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014