skip to content

Lamont, Jennifer Lee

CPSO#: 86580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lamont ( CPSO# 86580 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-1065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEE LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009