skip to content

Lamont, James Barry

CPSO#: 31730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone: (519) 258-4400 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-2295
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lamont ( CPSO# 31730 )

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Business Address:
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400


Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik, & Lamont, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2005
Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik & Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Karnik ( CPSO# 60518 )
Dr. H. Joshi ( CPSO# 53781 )
Dr. J. Lamont ( CPSO# 31730 )
Dr. R. Chopra ( CPSO# 31096 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Avenue
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES BARRY LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.