skip to content

Lamenza, Cecilia

CPSO#: 21148

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Colombia, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 39 Edgehill Road Etobicoke, ON M9A 4N1
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015