skip to content

Lambert, Albert Wayne

CPSO#: 25713

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.W. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sceinces North 41 Ramsey Lake Road Sudbury Ontario P3E 4K8
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019