skip to content

Lam-Shang-Leen, Jessica

CPSO#: 100975

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Lam-Shang-Leen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam-Shang-Leen ( CPSO# 100975)

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA LAM-SHANG-LEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM-SHANG-LEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017