skip to content

Lam, Wilson

CPSO#: 93359

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
6-608
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 4169464501 Ext. 3947
Fax: 4169464407 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wilson Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lam ( CPSO# 93359 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Unit 6-608
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILSON LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015