skip to content

Lam, Simon

CPSO#: 99961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 05 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 30 Jan 2017 to 23 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 2017