skip to content

Lam, Polly Yuet Wa

CPSO#: 100959

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Copper Creek Family Physicians
PH3 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472 9400
Fax: (905) 472 9409 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Polly Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lam ( CPSO# 100959)

Business Address:
E-1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 884-0666

Business Address:
PH3-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-9400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. POLLY YUET WA LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015