skip to content

Lam, Michael Andrew Chi-Lun

CPSO#: 89789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214-16775 Yonge St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8J4
Phone: 905 895 9777
Fax: 905 895 9720 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael A. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 89789 )

Business Address:
All Med Health Family Medicine and Walk-In Clinic
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-0777

Business Address:
214-16775 Yonge St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8J4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW CHI-LUN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010