skip to content

Lam, Kayla Kun-Yu

CPSO#: 95860

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: (905) 597-8809
Fax: (905) 597-8812 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kayla Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam ( CPSO# 95860 )

Business Address:
102-9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6

Business Address:
Suite 201
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAYLA KUN-YU LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 04 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 04 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015