Lam, Jennifer Ying-Kee (CPSO#: 99602)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 30 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2014 to 03 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2014