skip to content

Lam, Emilie Yat-Yee

CPSO#: 93091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Evergreen Hospice
Palliative Care Physicians
Suite 201
5762 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P1A8
Canada
Phone: 4164992185
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lam ( CPSO# 93091 )

Business Address:
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-2290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILIE YAT-YEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012