skip to content

Lam, Elaine Ming-Yu

CPSO#: 97320

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2012 to 09 Apr 2012
EL - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
EL - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2015