skip to content

Lam, Danica Cai-Feng

CPSO#: 91373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Multi Care Kidney Clinic
200 Church St.
York M9N 1N7
Canada
Phone: 4166582241
Fax: 4166582242
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Danica Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 91373 )

Business Address:
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 658-2241

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital - Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANICA CAI-FENG LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 14 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014