skip to content

Lam, Cindy Tze Yung

CPSO#: 95392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street, Suite 1-A
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3101 Bloor Street West
Suite 401
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 239-1968
Fax: (416) 233-4763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy T.Y. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lam ( CPSO# 95392 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Eye Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
501 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
401 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 239-1968

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CINDY TZE YUNG LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016