Lam, Andrea See Mun (CPSO#: 98311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
T and T Medical Clinic
Unit 26
3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905) 761-7765
Fax: (905) 761-6047
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lam ( CPSO# 98311 )

Business Address:
T and T Medical Clinic
26 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-7765

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA SEE MUN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017