skip to content

Lalonde, Sebastien

CPSO#: 95397

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:21 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018