skip to content

Lalani, Shifana

CPSO#: 100609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C
Victoria and Childrens Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 6132767975 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIFANA LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018