skip to content

Lalani, Nafisha

CPSO#: 95609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
BC Cancer - Vancouver
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9 Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Center 610 University Ave Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 14 Aug 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAFISHA LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2021