skip to content

Lal, Justiene

CPSO#: 90084

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1172 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M4M1L4
Phone: (647) 547-8181
Fax: (647) 547-8182 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

460 Renforth Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9C2N2
Canada
Phone: 647-547-8181
Fax: (647) 547-8182
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lindholm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lal ( CPSO# 90084 )
Dr. J. Lindholm ( CPSO# 90097 )

Business Address:
9 - 460 Renforth Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 547-8181


Corporation Name: Dr. Justiene Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lal ( CPSO# 90084 )

Business Address:
1172 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1L4
Phone Number: (647) 547-8181

Business Address:
Unit 9
460 Renforth Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 547-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTIENE LAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Jan 2009
EL - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 08 May 2009 to 02 Jun 2009
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009