skip to content

Laks, Jessica Allison

CPSO#: 97240

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2012 to 07 Mar 2012
EL - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
EL - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2021