skip to content

Lakra, Deepak Chand

CPSO#: 93424

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road - Suite 317
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: 416-840-5747
Fax: 416-840-0247 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deepak C. Lakra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lakra ( CPSO# 93424 )

Business Address:
Centenary Hospital Main Atrium
201-2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 840-5747

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEEPAK CHAND LAKRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2017