skip to content

Lakhani, Aly

CPSO#: 87271

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 482-8648
Fax: (905) 482-8647 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8 East - General Internal Medicine
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Fax: (416) 603-6495
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

16715 YONGE STREET
UNIT 22B
Newmarket ON  L3X 1X4
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-4184
Fax: (905) 898-5793
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aly Lakhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lakhani ( CPSO# 87271 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
14EN Room 208A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 482-8648

Business Address:
8E - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALY LAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009