skip to content

Lajeunesse, Benoit

CPSO#: 97939

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Medical Ruby
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone: (613) 632-0605 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benoit Lajeunesse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lajeunesse ( CPSO# 97939 )

Business Address:
Centre Medical Ruby
361 Main Street East
Suite 101
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone Number: (613) 632-0605

Business Address:
1111 Gurslain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENOIT LAJEUNESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJEUNESSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014