skip to content

Lajeunesse, Alain-Remi

CPSO#: 91591

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1740 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1J6N3
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: 343-888-2605 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alain-Remi Lajeunesse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lajeunesse ( CPSO# 91591 )

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
713 Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON  K1J 6N3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAIN-REMI LAJEUNESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJEUNESSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 15 Dec 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011