skip to content

Laird, Philip Rodney

CPSO#: 94129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 CF Health Services Centre
4 Entretien Ave
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K7B4
Canaeda
Phone: 613 541 5010 Ext. 3232
Fax: 613 817 9407 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 613 549 6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P.R. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014
Corporation Name: P.R. Laird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Laird ( CPSO# 94129 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:10 Feb 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP RODNEY LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010