skip to content

Laing, Courtney Lynn

CPSO#: 95393

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1C2
Phone: (519) 258-3200
Fax: (519) 258-0245 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Courtney Laing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY LYNN LAING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 28 Aug 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015