Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Sep 2013
Summary:
On September 4, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alan Ross Laing committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Laing admitted the allegation.
Dr. Laing failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to 25 patients, and exposed his patients to risk of harm, based on various deficiencies in his psychotherapy practice, including substandard record keeping, substandard care and boundary violations.
Dr. Laing has executed an undertaking to the College by which, among other things, he resigns his membership in the College effective October 10, 2013, undertakes never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after that date, and will be subject to continued supervision of his practice until his resignation takes effect.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
( Dr. Laing attend before the panel to be reprimanded
( Dr. Laing pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 11 Apr 1995
Summary:
On April 11, 1995, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Alan Ross Laing to be an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in subsection 1 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, and ordered that a set of conditions be imposed on Dr. Laing(s certificate of registration. On August 27, 1997, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered the removal of the conditions imposed pursuant to its order of April 11, 1995.
Appeal: Notice of Appeal