Lainey, Allison (CPSO#: 100185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matheson Lainey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lainey ( CPSO# 100185)
Dr. C. Matheson ( CPSO# 102969)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
370B Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 775-2533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 13 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON LAINEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAINEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016