skip to content

Laidley, David Thomas

CPSO#: 88741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Nuclear Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64751
Fax: (519) 646-6135 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Victoria Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

University Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Nuclear Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
236 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 593-5458
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

105-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph Medical Imaging
Phone: 226-314-1190
Fax: 519-763-3345
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David T. Laidley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Laidley ( CPSO# 88741 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodbridge ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
236 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Phone Number: (416) 593-5458

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Nuclear Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS LAIDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIDLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013