skip to content

Lai, Jen Chyang

CPSO#: 91611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doctor J.C. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 91611 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2020 Active
             Dr. Jen Chyang Lai may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.