skip to content

Lai, Jacob Ki To

CPSO#: 31987

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
19 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jacob Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2021