skip to content

Lai, Ingrid

CPSO#: 98132

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: 1-289-357-0100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ingrid Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Lai ( CPSO# 98132 )

Business Address:
400-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 357-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INGRID LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 26 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018