skip to content

Lai, Emily Jane

CPSO#: 84675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 Middlegate Rd
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1M3
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emily J. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lai ( CPSO# 84675 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Second Floor
1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1M3
Phone Number: (905) 804-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY JANE LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010