Lafleur, Jean-Marc Frederic Roger (CPSO#: 100576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Base Kingston
33 Canadian Forces Health Services
Centre
PO Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC FREDERIC ROGER LAFLEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLEUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2015