skip to content

Lafleche, Catherine Marie

CPSO#: 97896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Balmoral Health Group
1366 Yonge Street, suite 405
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416)923-5767
Fax: (416)923-5125 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

East Liberty Medical Centre
901 King Street West, suite 105
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-6000
Fax: (647) 776-2936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Catherine Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lafleche ( CPSO# 97896 )

Business Address:
Balmoral Health Group
405 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 923-5767

Business Address:
East Liberty Medical Centre
105 - 901 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 599-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE LAFLECHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLECHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014