skip to content

Ladak, Karim

CPSO#: 101262

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
708 - 25 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARIM LADAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018