skip to content

Lacombe, Christina

CPSO#: 92726

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Mar 2022
EXPIRY DATE
17 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Mar 2022