skip to content

Labow, Stanley Sam

CPSO#: 21725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
18 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley S. Labow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Filebank Phone: 1-800-377-3453
Instructions: Patients looking to request a copy of their medical record should contact the phone number above.
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 2021