Labib, Yasser Mohamed Aly (CPSO#: 89584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Nov 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6290
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Labib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Labib ( CPSO# 89584 )

Business Address:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Department of Anaesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6B4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Yasser Mohamed Aly Labib may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School
                        of  Medicine,  in  which Dr. Labib holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration  will  expire  on  the  earlier  of  the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on June 30, 2020,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Labib no longer holds the academic appointment at the rank
                        of  Assistant  Professor in the Department of Anaesthesia, Division
                        of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a decision about Dr. Labib's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.
                  
            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Labib's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on November 9, 2011.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2020.