Labib, Noura Ahmed Maher Emam (CPSO#: 89262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 3634
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton St E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noura Labib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Labib ( CPSO# 89262 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare System Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOURA AHMED MAHER EMAM LABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014