Labbe, Myrlande (CPSO#: 99702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Ottawa Community Family Health
Team
Ottawa ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: 613-590-0533
Fax: 613-590-7351
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRLANDE LABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016