skip to content

Laba-Kaczmarek, Jessica Anne

CPSO#: 97190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Munger Ave W
PO Box 100
Harrow ON  N0R 1G0
Phone: (519) 738-4844 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Pollard drive
Harrow ON  N0R1G0
Canada
Phone: 5197382286
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Erie Shores Healthcare Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laba-Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laba-Kaczmarek ( CPSO# 97190 )

Business Address:
Leamington District
Memorial Hosptail
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
32 Munger Avenue West
PO Box 100
Essex ON  N0R 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 738-3555

Business Address:
1 Pollard Drive
Essex ON  N0R 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 738-2286


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE LABA-KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA-KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018