First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |